TX SB1697 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirements for a change of name for a person with a final felony conviction or a person required to register as a sex offender.
Title
Relating to the requirements for a change of name for a person with a final felony conviction or a person required to register as a sex offender.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2623 (Same As) 2019-05-25 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
CHANGED & ASSUMED NAMES
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Family
Family--General
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Family
Family--General
SEXUAL OFFENDERS