TX SB1707 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the duties of school district peace officers, school resource officers, and security personnel.
Title
Relating to the duties of school district peace officers, school resource officers, and security personnel.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1422 (Y: 100 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1406 (Y: 129 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1406 (Y: 129 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-02 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-02 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-16 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-16 | House | Record vote RV#1422 |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | House | Record vote RV#1406 |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3470 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
DEAF, TEXAS SCHOOL FOR THE
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety