TX SB1734 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the dissolution of a non-profit direct-support organization.
Title
Relating to the dissolution of a non-profit direct-support organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-05-07 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |