TX SB1738 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an education and training program on interacting with and supporting individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities for certain public transportation vehicle operators.
Title
Relating to an education and training program on interacting with and supporting individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities for certain public transportation vehicle operators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit