TX SB1739 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to payment for care provided by a chiropractor under certain health benefit plans; providing administrative penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to payment for care provided by a chiropractor under certain health benefit plans; providing administrative penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1258 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-13SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-13SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-10HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1258
2019-05-10HousePassed
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-10HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-10HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 1410
2019-05-09HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-07HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-07HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-06HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-05-06HouseRead first time
2019-05-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-03SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenatePassed
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-03SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-03SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-25SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-25SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-06SenateFiled
2019-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1410 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback