TX SB1772 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a temporary exemption from ad valorem taxation of a portion of the appraised value of certain property damaged by a disaster.
Title
Relating to a temporary exemption from ad valorem taxation of a portion of the appraised value of certain property damaged by a disaster.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] |
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Larry Taylor [R] | Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-16 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4433 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - Referred to Ways & Means
SJR57 (Enabling for) 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
SJR57 (Enabling for) 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions