TX SB1776 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the development of an elective course for public high school students on the founding principles of the United States and the posting of the founding documents of the United States in public school buildings.
Title
Relating to the development of an elective course for public high school students on the founding principles of the United States and the posting of the founding documents of the United States in public school buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts