TX SB1777 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the United States history end-of-course assessment instrument for public high school students.
Title
Relating to the United States history end-of-course assessment instrument for public high school students.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1777 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01777I.htm |