TX SB1784 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the deduction from applied income of compensation paid to guardians of certain Medicaid recipients.
Title
Relating to the deduction from applied income of compensation paid to guardians of certain Medicaid recipients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1419 (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-02 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-02 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-16 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-16 | House | Record vote RV#1419 |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |