TX SB1787 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to measures to facilitate the transfer, academic progress, and timely graduation of students in public higher education.
Title
Relating to measures to facilitate the transfer, academic progress, and timely graduation of students in public higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB25 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
HB4018 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4018 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
EDUCATION--HIGHER--CURRICULUM
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
EDUCATION--HIGHER--CURRICULUM
Education--Junior College Districts
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1787 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01787I.htm |