TX SB1794 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the calculation of costs in interagency contracts between certain state agencies and the State Office of Administrative Hearings.
Title
Relating to the calculation of costs in interagency contracts between certain state agencies and the State Office of Administrative Hearings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1258 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-22 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1258 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-10 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 2583 |
2019-05-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-05-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2583 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, STATE OFFICE OF
Environment
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
Utilities
Utilities--General
Environment
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
Utilities
Utilities--General