TX SB1801 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to orders of nondisclosure for certain victims of trafficking of persons or compelling prostitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to orders of nondisclosure for certain victims of trafficking of persons or compelling prostitution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1436 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-16SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-16SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-16HouseRecord vote RV#1436
2019-05-16HousePassed
2019-05-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-15HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-04-26HouseRead first time
2019-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-17SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-18SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1216 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback