TX SB1804 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public health and safety; authorizing the imposition of a tax.
Title
Relating to public health and safety; authorizing the imposition of a tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Reason for vote recorded in Journal RV#1611 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Reason for vote recorded in Journal RV#1611 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1611 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-22 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Amended 1-Nevárez |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 3-Herrero |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 2-Craddick |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 1-Nevárez |
2019-05-21 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-20 | House | Postponed 5/21/19 8:00 AM |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-04-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4751 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
CRIMINAL JUSTICE DIVISION, GOVERNOR'S OFFICE
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Family Violence
Law Enforcement
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
CRIMINAL JUSTICE DIVISION, GOVERNOR'S OFFICE
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Family Violence
Law Enforcement
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF