TX SB181 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to suspension of a driver's license for persons convicted of certain offenses and the educational program required for reinstatement of a license following certain convictions; authorizing a fine.
Title
Relating to suspension of a driver's license for persons convicted of certain offenses and the educational program required for reinstatement of a license following certain convictions; authorizing a fine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1378 (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1378 (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | See remarks for effective date | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1378 |
2021-05-24 | House | Passed |
2021-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-23 | House | Amended 2-White |
2021-05-23 | House | Amended 1-White |
2021-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-22 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB556 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
DRIVER EDUCATION & SAFETY CLASSES
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Crimes--Drugs
DRIVER EDUCATION & SAFETY CLASSES
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses