TX SB1830 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the appraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of certain nonexempt property used for low-income or moderate-income housing.
Title
Relating to the appraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of certain nonexempt property used for low-income or moderate-income housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2993 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Referred to Property Tax
Subjects
Housing
Housing--Finance
Housing--General
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Housing--Finance
Housing--General
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1830 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01830I.htm |