TX SB1840 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the assistance and technology fund and use of money in the fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the assistance and technology fund and use of money in the fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1508 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1507 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-21 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-19SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-19SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-17HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1508
2019-05-17HousePassed
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1507
2019-05-17HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2019-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-04-29HouseRead first time
2019-04-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-25SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-25SenateRecord vote
2019-04-25SenatePassed
2019-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-25SenateRecord vote
2019-04-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-18SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1805 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1840
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01840I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01840S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01840E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01840H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01840F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-25-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-25-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1840&RcdVtNo=1507&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1840&RcdVtNo=1508&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019

Bill Comments

feedback