TX SB1845 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the change of the name of Texas A&M University--Kingsville to Texas A&I University.
Title
Relating to the change of the name of Texas A&M University--Kingsville to Texas A&I University.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-27 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-04-27 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-24 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-03-24 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
GIFTS & DONATIONS
TEXAS A&I UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY--KINGSVILLE
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
GIFTS & DONATIONS
TEXAS A&I UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY--KINGSVILLE
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=SB1845 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/SB01845I.htm |