TX SB1845 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the amendment of the dedicatory instruments of certain mixed-use real estate developments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the amendment of the dedicatory instruments of certain mixed-use real estate developments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Passed RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1608
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-16HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-13HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-13HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2019-05-01HouseRead first time
2019-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-26SenateRecord vote
2019-04-26SenatePassed
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenateRecord vote
2019-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-25SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-18SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2990 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback