TX SB185 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to Energy Resources
Pending: House Energy Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to Energy Resources
Pending: House Energy Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to disclosure requirements regarding certain oil or gas well accidents.
Title
Relating to disclosure requirements regarding certain oil or gas well accidents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2019-05-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Miles |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ALERT SYSTEM
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Electronic Information Systems
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Oil & Gas
PERMITS
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Safety
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Electronic Information Systems
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Oil & Gas
PERMITS
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Safety