TX SB1854 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the inclusion of local school health advisory councils as governmental bodies for purposes of the open meetings law and the public information law.
Title
Relating to the inclusion of local school health advisory councils as governmental bodies for purposes of the open meetings law and the public information law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-05-07 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Open Records
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Open Records