TX SB1874 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the timely filing of reports of political contributions and expenditures; increasing a criminal penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the timely filing of reports of political contributions and expenditures; increasing a criminal penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-20SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-19SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-13SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2019-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-06SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-05-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-18SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback