TX SB1879 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to firearms training for county jailers.
Title
Relating to firearms training for county jailers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-05-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3503 (Same As) 2019-06-15 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
JAILERS & PRISON GUARDS
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Weapons
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
JAILERS & PRISON GUARDS
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Weapons