TX SB1882 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notice regarding voting by physicians at certain entities to authorize the differentiation of physicians based on maintenance of certification.
Title
Relating to notice regarding voting by physicians at certain entities to authorize the differentiation of physicians based on maintenance of certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-17 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2019-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Buckingham |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4215 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Referred to Public Health
Subjects
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
Hospitals
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS