TX SB191 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of the driver responsibility program and the amount and allocation of state traffic fine funds; temporarily increasing a criminal fine.
Title
Relating to the repeal of the driver responsibility program and the amount and allocation of state traffic fine funds; temporarily increasing a criminal fine.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB683 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Subjects
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB191 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00191I.htm |