TX SB1913 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing certain cities to change the date on which their general election for officers is held.
Title
Relating to authorizing certain cities to change the date on which their general election for officers is held.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-16 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2019-05-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |