TX SB1928 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an African American Texans memorial monument on the Capitol grounds.
Title
Relating to an African American Texans memorial monument on the Capitol grounds.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Sen. Rodney Ellis [D] | Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-30 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-05-30 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-23 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-21 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-20 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to House Administration | |
2011-05-19 | Read first time | |
2011-05-19 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-05-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-17 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-04 | Referred to Administration | |
2011-05-04 | Read first time | |
2011-05-04 | Permission to introduce | |
2011-05-04 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
PRESERVATION BOARD, STATE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE CAPITOL BUILDING & GROUNDS
State Employees
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE CAPITOL BUILDING & GROUNDS
State Employees