TX SB1928 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to ensuring local governmental and community input in any federal refugee resettlement program established in this state.
Title
Relating to ensuring local governmental and community input in any federal refugee resettlement program established in this state.
Sponsors
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - SB 1928Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | House | Passed |
2015-05-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-27 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-26 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-05-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-21 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2015-05-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Border Security by Pres |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |