TX SB1928 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a certificate of merit in certain actions against certain licensed or registered professionals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a certificate of merit in certain actions against certain licensed or registered professionals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Amended RV#1404 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-23SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23SenateRecord vote
2019-05-23SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-15HouseRecord vote RV#1404
2019-05-15HousePassed as amended
2019-05-15HouseAmended 1-Krause
2019-05-15HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-05-01HouseRead first time
2019-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-26SenateRecord vote
2019-04-26SenatePassed
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenateRecord vote
2019-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-23SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-19SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-19SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2440 (Same As) 2019-04-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback