TX SB1931 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality to conduct background checks.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality to conduct background checks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Environment
Environment--Air
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
Environment--Solid Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
INJECTION WELLS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
WATER
Water--General
Environment
Environment--Air
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
Environment--Solid Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
INJECTION WELLS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
WATER
Water--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1931 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01931I.htm |