TX SB1938 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certificates of convenience and necessity for the construction of facilities for the transmission of electricity.
Title
Relating to certificates of convenience and necessity for the construction of facilities for the transmission of electricity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1077 (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1029 (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1029 (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-07 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1077 |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#1029 |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion CSHB 3995 |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hancock |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3995 (Same As) 2019-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call