TX SB1949 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
Pending: House Pensions, Investments & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
Pending: House Pensions, Investments & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of laws of this state to certain consumer financial transactions.
Title
Relating to the applicability of laws of this state to certain consumer financial transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-24 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |