TX SB1959 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the maritime port plans, reports, and programs prepared by the Port Authority Advisory Committee.
Title
Relating to the maritime port plans, reports, and programs prepared by the Port Authority Advisory Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1171 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-21 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-09 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1171 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 3207 |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-05-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3207 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
PORT AUTHORITY ADVISORY COMMITTEE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous