TX SB1970 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the filing of an assumed name certificate by certain business entities.
Title
Relating to the filing of an assumed name certificate by certain business entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3609 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19