TX SB1980 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to political contributions and political expenditures made to or by political committees or other persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to political contributions and political expenditures made to or by political committees or other persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-16HouseReferred to Elections
2019-05-16HouseRead first time
2019-05-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-15SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-08SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-02SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-02SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-02SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-25SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-25SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-19SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-19SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2586 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback