TX SB1987 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the selection and administration of an appraisal review board in certain counties; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the selection and administration of an appraisal review board in certain counties; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-05-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--Finance
Elections
Elections--Candidates
Elections--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--Finance
Elections
Elections--Candidates
Elections--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts