TX SB1991 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to claims processes and reimbursement for, and overpayment recoupment processes imposed on, health care providers under Medicaid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to claims processes and reimbursement for, and overpayment recoupment processes imposed on, health care providers under Medicaid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1986 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1616 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Record vote RV#1590 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - RV#1588 RV#1589 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - RV#1588 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1986
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26SenateRemarks ordered printed
2019-05-26SenateRecord vote
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-23SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-23HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-23HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-23SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-23SenateSenate requests conference committee
2019-05-23SenateSenate refuses to concur
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1616
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1590
2019-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1589
2019-05-21HouseAmended 2-Klick
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1588
2019-05-21HouseAmended 1-Klick
2019-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-05-02HouseRead first time
2019-05-01HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-01SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-01SenateRecord vote
2019-05-01SenatePassed
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenateRecord vote
2019-05-01SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-01SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-01SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-25SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-19SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-19SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4192 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1991
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01991I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01991S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01991E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01991H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01991F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-01-F.PDF#page=19
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1991&RcdVtNo=1588&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1991&RcdVtNo=1589&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1991&RcdVtNo=1590&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1991&RcdVtNo=1616&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1991&RcdVtNo=1986&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=27

Bill Comments

feedback