TX SB2014 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to voluntary contributions to the cancer prevention and research fund for pediatric cancer research.
Title
Relating to voluntary contributions to the cancer prevention and research fund for pediatric cancer research.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CANCER
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
LICENSE PLATES
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
LICENSE PLATES
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB2014 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02014I.htm |