TX SB2018 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to abolishing a dissolution committee established to abolish certain county boards of education or boards of county school trustees and appointing commissioners courts to assume the duties of the dissolution committee.
Title
Relating to abolishing a dissolution committee established to abolish certain county boards of education or boards of county school trustees and appointing commissioners courts to assume the duties of the dissolution committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1361 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1361 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1361 |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3387 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Education
Education--County Administration
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Taxation
Taxation--School District
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Education--County Administration
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Taxation
Taxation--School District
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous