TX SB2021 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to providing access to local health departments and certain health service regional offices under Medicaid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to providing access to local health departments and certain health service regional offices under Medicaid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-06HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-05-06HouseRead first time
2019-05-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-03SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenatePassed
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-03SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-03SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-02SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-26SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-26SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3695 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback