TX SB2022 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the Harris County Hospital District.
Title
Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the Harris County Hospital District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3459 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Effective immediately
Subjects
HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Health Care Providers
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Health Care Providers
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital