TX SB2042 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study by the Texas Education Agency of career and technology education programs.
Title
Relating to a study by the Texas Education Agency of career and technology education programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-16 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-14 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-04-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-24 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Lucio |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4282 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Referred to Public Education
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Science & Technology
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Science & Technology