TX SB2071 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of the port commission of the Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas.
Title
Relating to the composition of the port commission of the Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2924 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Subjects
CORPUS CHRISTI, CITY OF
NUECES COUNTY
PORT OF CORPUS CHRISTI AUTHORITY OF NUECES COUNTY
SAN PATRICIO COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
NUECES COUNTY
PORT OF CORPUS CHRISTI AUTHORITY OF NUECES COUNTY
SAN PATRICIO COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB2071 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02071I.htm |