TX SB2075 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public school compliance with dyslexia screening, reading instrument requirements, and a requirement that a school district notify certain parents or guardians of a program providing students with reading disabilities the ability to borrow audiobooks free of charge.
Title
Relating to public school compliance with dyslexia screening, reading instrument requirements, and a requirement that a school district notify certain parents or guardians of a program providing students with reading disabilities the ability to borrow audiobooks free of charge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1508 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1507 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1507 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-19 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-17 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1508 |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1507 |
2019-05-17 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1199 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
DYSLEXIA
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety