TX SB208 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting the operation of concrete plants and crushing facilities at certain locations.
Title
Relating to prohibiting the operation of concrete plants and crushing facilities at certain locations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3817 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Environmental Regulation
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB208 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00208I.htm |