TX SB2086 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a single Internet portal or equivalent electronic system through which Medicaid providers may submit and receive information.
Title
Relating to a single Internet portal or equivalent electronic system through which Medicaid providers may submit and receive information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-05-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-14 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hinojosa |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2221 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
INTERNET
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
INTERNET
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID