TX SB2093 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to subpoenas, orders, and warrants for the disclosure of location information, electronic customer communications records, and electronic customer data and for the use of pen registers, ESN readers, cell site simulators, and mobile tracking devices; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to subpoenas, orders, and warrants for the disclosure of location information, electronic customer communications records, and electronic customer data and for the use of pen registers, ESN readers, cell site simulators, and mobile tracking devices; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3453 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Law Enforcement
SEARCH WARRANTS
SUBPOENAS
Criminal Procedure--General
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Law Enforcement
SEARCH WARRANTS
SUBPOENAS