TX SB2111 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Health and Human Services Commission developing a plan to contract with a public institution of higher education to operate a certain state hospital.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Health and Human Services Commission developing a plan to contract with a public institution of higher education to operate a certain state hospital.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1546 (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1546
2019-05-21HousePassed
2019-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-13HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-10HouseReported favorably as amended
2019-05-10HouseAmendment(s) considered in committee
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-08HouseMeeting cancelled
2019-05-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07HousePosting rule suspended
2019-05-06HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-05-06HouseRead first time
2019-04-30HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-30SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-30SenateRecord vote
2019-04-30SenatePassed
2019-04-30SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-30SenateRecord vote
2019-04-30SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-30SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-30SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-24SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback