TX SB2114 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to studying the costs and benefits of a pilot program for employment and community integration services for adults with autism and other developmental disabilities.
Title
Relating to studying the costs and benefits of a pilot program for employment and community integration services for adults with autism and other developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-24 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AUTISM & PERVASIVE DEVELOPMENTAL DISORDERS
Disabilities, Persons with
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Housing
Housing--Disabled Persons
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Disabilities, Persons with
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Housing
Housing--Disabled Persons
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development