TX SB2114 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain duties of law enforcement agencies concerning certain information subject to disclosure to a defendant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain duties of law enforcement agencies concerning certain information subject to disclosure to a defendant.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-05-02HouseRead first time
2019-04-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-25SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-25SenateRecord vote
2019-04-25SenatePassed
2019-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-25SenateRecord vote
2019-04-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-10SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-04-09SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-04-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback