TX SB2119 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transfer of the regulation of motor fuel metering and motor fuel quality from the Department of Agriculture to the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation; providing civil and administrative penalties; creating criminal offenses; requiring occupational licenses; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to the transfer of the regulation of motor fuel metering and motor fuel quality from the Department of Agriculture to the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation; providing civil and administrative penalties; creating criminal offenses; requiring occupational licenses; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Amended RV#1435 (Y: 129 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Amended RV#1435 (Y: 129 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | See remarks for effective date | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-16 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-16 | House | Record vote RV#1435 |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-16 | House | Amended 1-Goldman |
2019-05-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-15 | House | Amended 2-Goldman |
2019-05-15 | House | Amended 1-Goldman |
2019-05-15 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-04-15 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hall |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1695 (Similar To) 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Oil & Gas
Taxation
Taxation--Motor Fuels
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Oil & Gas
Taxation
Taxation--Motor Fuels